+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1058
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2410a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.687
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
May 8, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 11
May 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor