+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.95
- Signed Chap.776
On December 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.691
- Substituted For A4529
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1462
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21