+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.168
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1771
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2332a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
June 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor