+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2306b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2306a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor