+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1424
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1350
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 6, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor