+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.772
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.876
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
May 24, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor