+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.579
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2277a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.901
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (6)
May 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor