+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading (t) 2257b
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 2257a
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.232
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to cities
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.423
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to cities
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Cities - Mar 4, 2014
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: nay
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
April 23, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Cities - Apr 23, 2013
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea