+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1016
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.95
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
March 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor