+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.267
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.517
- Substituted For A4738a
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.475
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2251a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1348
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 28, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6