+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary