+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2231c
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2231b
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2155
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2231a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1