+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1128
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.113
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 2
March 26, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor