+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.252
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.179
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 19, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
March 4, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 25, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor