+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.78
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.595
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
January 26, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
May 27, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor