+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amend By Restoring To Original Print 2175
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2175a
On March 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.258
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor