+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.100
On November 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.396
- Substituted For A7035a
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1629
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2161a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15