+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.184
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.356
- Substituted For A8160
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1537
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2154a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (3)
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 12, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
February 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11