+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1836
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (4)
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor