+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.601
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor