+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.864
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1