+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.227
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.685
- Substituted For A8345
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 213a
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.953
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19