+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.914
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2124b
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.827
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2124a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19