+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a2288a
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading (t) 2122a
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.231
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Vote
March 19, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - Mar 19, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor