+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1841a
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1105
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2122a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor