+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1448
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2106c
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1611
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2106b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Education
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2106a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (4)
June 14, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor