+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.592
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1156
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
June 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
June 4, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor