+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1534
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.155
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (6)
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
February 26, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1