+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.386
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.113
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
February 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor