+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.426
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1606
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63