+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1371a
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 208a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.430
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Internet And Technology
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Internet And Technology)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor