+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Secretary Of State
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.181
- Substituted For A2064
- Referred To Judiciary
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.140
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 17
February 11, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor