+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.224
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.226
- Substituted For A4153
On March 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.269
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.98
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
February 26, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor