+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.360
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor