+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.587
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1