+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1533
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2060a
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.571
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (7)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
March 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor