+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.207
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7