+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.231
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.152
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (3)
January 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 15
March 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 14