+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2025b
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2025a
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.874
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1622
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 8, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor