+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1215
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2013a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.972
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (5)
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor