+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 2004c
- Amend and recommit to investigations and government operations
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 2004b
- Amend and recommit to investigations and government operations
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 2004a
- Amend and recommit to finance
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
+ − Vote
April 16, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - Apr 16, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea