+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.95
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2