+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1295
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.537
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
April 4, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19