+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1169
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1835
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (6)
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 15, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor