+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7256a
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1300
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 1979a
- Amend And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Vote
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor