+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1828
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1964a
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.942
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 10, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor