+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 1954a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.273
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.93
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
February 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor