+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.278
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.177
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
June 5, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor