+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.970
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.351
- Substituted For A5423
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.147
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
March 19, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor