+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.182
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
January 23, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor